There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to simplify the reporting requirements relating to higher education tuition and related expenses.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
01/16/2002Became Public Law No: 107-131. (TXT | PDF)
01/16/2002Signed by President.
01/04/2002Presented to President.
12/20/2001Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S14052)
12/04/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8801)
11/27/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/16/2002Became Public Law No: 107-131. (TXT | PDF)
01/16/2002Signed by President.
01/04/2002HousePresented to President.
12/21/2001SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2001SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S14052)
12/05/2001SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
12/04/2001-6:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/04/2001-6:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8801)
12/04/2001-5:41pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3346.
12/04/2001-5:41pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8801-8803)
12/04/2001-5:40pmHouseMr. Hulshof moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/27/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
11/27/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means11/27/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3346.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3346. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (12/04/2001)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to require any person which is an eligible educational institution (current law requires any person which is an eligible educational institution which receives payments for qualified tuition and related expenses with respect to any individual for any calendar year or which makes reimbursements or refunds to any individual of qualified tuition and related expenses) which enrolls any individual for any academic period to meet specified return requirements. Revises requirements concerning the form and manner of such returns.