There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

General Aviation Industry Reparations Act of 2002

Short Titles as Introduced

General Aviation Industry Reparations Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide economic relief to general aviation entities that have suffered substantial economic injury as a result of the terrorist attacks perpetrated against the United States on September 11, 2001.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
04/15/2002Committee on The Budget discharged.
04/15/2002Committee on Financial Services discharged.
04/15/2002Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 107-406, Part I.
11/27/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date All Actions
04/15/2002Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 241.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/15/2002Committee on The Budget discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/15/2002Committee on Financial Services discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/15/2002House Committee on The Budget Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than April 15, 2002.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/15/2002House Committee on Financial Services Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than April 15, 2002.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/15/2002Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 107-406, Part I.
02/27/2002Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/27/2002Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
12/13/2001Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation
12/13/2001Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation
11/30/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Domestic Monetary Policy, Technology and Economic Growth.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
11/28/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/27/2001Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/27/2001Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/27/2001Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/27/2001Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/27/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (32)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure11/27/2001 Referred to
02/27/2002 Markup by
04/15/2002 Reported by H. Rept. 107-406
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation11/28/2001 Referred to
12/13/2001 Markup by
12/13/2001 Reported by
House Financial Services11/27/2001 Referred to
04/15/2002 Discharged from
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Domestic Monetary Policy, Technology, and Economic Growth11/30/2001 Referred to
House Budget11/27/2001 Referred to
04/15/2002 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3347. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (04/15/2002)

General Aviation Industry Reparations Act of 2002 - Directs the President to take certain actions to compensate general aviation entities and their employees for economic injuries incurred by them as a result of the terrorist attacks on the United States on September 11, 2001, including to: (1) issue them federal credit instruments (including subsidy amounts for such instruments) in the aggregate not to exceed $3 billion; and (2) compensate them and employees in the aggregate not to exceed $2.5 billion for direct losses incurred as a result of any Federal ground stop order or flight restrictions for a period of one week or more imposed in response to the increased security required by such attacks, as well as certain incremental losses, especially those incurred by employees of an entity receiving assistance who lost their jobs (other than for cause) as a result of such attacks. Designates the amount of new budget authority and outlays in all fiscal years resulting from this Act as an emergency requirement pursuant to the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 (Gramm-Rudman-Hollings Act).

(Sec. 3) Authorizes the Air Transportation Stabilization Board to enter into agreements with one or more obligors to issue such instruments. Sets forth certain Board and instrument requirements.

(Sec. 4) Limits the amount of compensation payable to a general aviation entity and employee.

(Sec. 6) Amends Federal aviation law to authorize the Secretary of Transportation to provide insurance or reinsurance, or reimbursement of insurance costs increases, to a general aviation entity against loss or damage arising from the operation of nonmilitary aircraft while in the United States.

(Sec. 7) Requires the President to report to specified congressional committees on the amount of assistance provided under this Act to each general aviation entity, including the financial status of such entity.

(Sec. 8) Authorizes the President to issue a Federal credit instrument to a general aviation entity if it has entered into a binding agreement to: (1) pay costs attributable to providing health insurance coverage for former and current employees who lost their jobs and coverage because of the terrorist attacks; and (2) maintain current health benefit and contribution levels for currently insured employees. Limits the obligation of a general aviation entity to pay for and maintain such coverage to a six month period.

(Sec. 9) Defines "general aviation entity" to mean any person (non-air carrier) that: (1) operates nonmilitary aircraft to conduct its primary business; (2) manufactures nonmilitary aircraft with a maximum seating capacity of fewer than 20 passengers, or aircraft parts to be used in such aircraft; (3) provides services necessary for nonmilitary operations; or (4) operates a nonprimary airport meeting certain criteria. Includes fixed based operators, flight schools, manufacturers of general aviation aircraft and products, persons engaged in nonscheduled aviation enterprises, and general aviation independent contractors.