Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 11/27/2001
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 11/27/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/06/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 12/06/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/06/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 12/06/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 12/06/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/06/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/06/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 12/06/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 12/06/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/06/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/06/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 12/06/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/06/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/06/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/13/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/13/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/13/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 12/13/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 12/13/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 12/18/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 12/18/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 12/18/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 12/20/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/20/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/20/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/20/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 01/24/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 01/24/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 02/26/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/26/2002