Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 11/28/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 11/28/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 11/28/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/05/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 12/13/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/24/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 01/24/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 01/24/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 01/24/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/07/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/07/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/27/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/07/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/07/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/24/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/16/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/10/2002