Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 01/31/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/14/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/14/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/14/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/14/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/14/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/14/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/01/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/01/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/01/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/01/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/01/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/01/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/01/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/01/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/07/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/08/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/13/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/13/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/13/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/15/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/15/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/15/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/20/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/20/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/20/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/20/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/20/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/20/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 03/22/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/27/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/29/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/29/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/29/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/29/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/03/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/24/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/26/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/02/2001
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/02/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/03/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/15/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/24/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/27/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/13/2002