Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 12/06/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 12/06/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 12/06/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 12/06/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 12/06/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 12/06/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 12/06/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 12/06/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/06/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/06/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/06/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 12/06/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 12/06/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/06/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/06/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 12/06/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/06/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/06/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 12/06/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 12/06/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 12/06/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/06/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/06/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/06/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 12/06/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 12/06/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/06/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 12/06/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 12/06/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 12/06/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/06/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 12/06/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/06/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/06/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 12/06/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 12/06/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/06/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 12/06/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 12/06/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/06/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 12/12/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 12/12/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 12/12/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 12/12/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/12/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 12/12/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/12/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/12/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 12/12/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/12/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 12/12/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 12/12/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/12/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/12/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 12/12/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/12/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 12/12/2001
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/12/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 12/12/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 12/12/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/12/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 12/12/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 12/19/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/19/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 12/19/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 12/19/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/19/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 12/19/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/19/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 12/19/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 12/19/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 12/19/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 12/19/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 12/19/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 12/19/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 12/19/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 12/19/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/19/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/19/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/23/2002
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 01/23/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/23/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/23/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 01/23/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 01/23/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/23/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/23/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/23/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/13/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/13/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/05/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/05/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/11/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/11/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/09/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/22/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/05/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/25/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/15/2002