There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Embassy Employee Compensation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Embassy Employee Compensation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide compensation for the United States citizens who were victims of the bombings of United States embassies in East Africa on August 7, 1998, on the same basis as compensation is provided to victims of the terrorist-related aircraft crashes on September 11, 2001.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/21/2002Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 391 - 18 (Roll no. 176).(text: CR H2680-2681)
05/20/2002Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 107-477.
11/29/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
07/11/2002SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
05/22/2002SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
05/21/2002-2:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/21/2002-2:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 391 - 18 (Roll no. 176). (text: CR H2680-2681)
05/21/2002-2:00pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2746-2747)
05/21/2002-12:08pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/21/2002-11:36amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3375.
05/21/2002-11:36amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2680-2685)
05/21/2002-11:36amHouseMr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/20/2002HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 287.
05/20/2002HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 107-477.
04/24/2002HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
04/24/2002HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/15/2002HouseSubcommittee on Immigration and Claims Discharged.
01/14/2002HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/29/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
11/29/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 11/29/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 12/19/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/19/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/19/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 12/19/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/19/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 12/19/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 12/19/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/19/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/13/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/13/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/13/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/13/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/13/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/13/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/13/2002
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/13/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/13/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/13/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/14/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/14/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/27/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/27/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/27/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/05/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/20/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/20/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/18/2002

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary11/29/2001 Referred to
04/24/2002 Markup by
05/20/2002 Reported by H. Rept. 107-477
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims01/14/2002 Referred to
04/15/2002 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary05/22/2002 Referred to
07/11/2002 Markup by

No related bill information was received for H.R.3375.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3375. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (05/20/2002)

Embassy Employee Compensation Act - Directs the Attorney General, through the Special Master appointed under the September 11th Victim Compensation Fund of 2001, to administer compensation to American victims of the August 7, 1998, bombings of the U.S. embassies in Kenya and Tanzania. Authorizes appropriations.

(Sec. 5) Requires claimants to provide information to the Special Master concerning the physical harm suffered and any possible economic and noneconomic losses incurred from the bombings, as well as the "collateral sources" of compensation received or entitled to be received, defined as life insurance, pension funds, death benefit programs and payments by Federal, State, or local governments. Sets a two-year limit on filing claims, beginning after the promulgation of regulations to implement the Act.

Directs the Special Master to determine whether a claimant is eligible for compensation and, if so, the amount to be disbursed based on harm suffered, facts of the claim, and individual circumstances of the claimant.

Prohibits the Special Master from considering negligence or any other theory of liability with regard to claimants. Requires completion of the review and determination of a claim within 120 days after it is filed. Makes the Special Master's decision on a claim final and not subject to judicial review.

Specifies that punitive damages may not be awarded. Requires that any award be reduced by collateral source compensation a claimant has received or is entitled to receive.

Makes eligible to receive compensation any U.S. citizens who suffered physical harm from the bombing of the United States embassy in Nairobi, Kenya, or from the bombing of the embassy in Dar es Salaam, Tanzania. Permits personal representatives of U.S. citizens killed by either bombing to receive compensation on behalf of the deceased.

Limits claims to one per individual. Provides that upon filing a claim, an individual waives the right to seek damages in civil suits in Federal or State courts, except for pursuing collateral source compensation.

(Sec. 6) Requires the Special Master to authorize payments to eligible claimants not later than 20 days after the date on which the determination of the amount has been made.

Declares that this Act constitutes budget authority in advance of appropriations Acts and represents the obligation of the Federal Government to provide for the payment of compensation under the Act.

Authorizes the Attorney General to accept contributions from individuals, business concerns, and other entities to carry out the Act, and directs the Attorney General to use donated funds before appropriated funds.

(Sec. 8) Declares that the United States has the right of subrogation with respect to any claim paid from U.S. funds under the Act.