Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 11/29/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/29/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 12/19/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/19/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/19/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 12/19/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/19/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 12/19/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 12/19/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/19/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/13/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/13/2002
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/13/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/13/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/13/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/13/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/13/2002
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/13/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/13/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/13/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/14/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/14/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/27/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/27/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/27/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/05/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/20/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/20/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/18/2002