Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/04/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 12/05/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/05/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/05/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 12/05/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/06/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 12/11/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 12/12/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/12/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/12/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 12/13/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 12/13/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 12/13/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/18/2001