Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 01/31/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/31/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/31/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/31/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/31/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/31/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/06/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/06/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/06/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/06/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/06/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/06/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 02/06/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 02/06/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/06/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/06/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/06/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/06/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/06/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 02/06/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/08/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/13/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/13/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 02/13/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/13/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/13/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/13/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/13/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/26/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/26/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/26/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/27/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/27/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/27/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/27/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/28/2001
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 03/06/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/06/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/06/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 03/08/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 03/13/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/13/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/13/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/13/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 03/15/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/28/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/03/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/03/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/03/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/03/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/26/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/26/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/26/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/26/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/01/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/08/2001