Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 12/05/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 12/05/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 12/05/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 12/05/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/06/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 12/06/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/06/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/06/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 12/06/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 12/06/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/06/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 12/11/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/11/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 12/12/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/12/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 12/12/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/12/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/13/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/13/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/13/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/13/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/13/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/13/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 12/13/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/13/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/13/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 12/13/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 12/13/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 12/13/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 12/13/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 12/18/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 12/18/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 12/19/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/19/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/19/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/19/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 12/19/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/19/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/19/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/19/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 12/19/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/19/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/19/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/19/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/20/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 12/20/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/23/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/23/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/29/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/29/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 01/29/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/05/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/06/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/12/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/12/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/13/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/13/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 02/26/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/26/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 02/26/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/26/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/26/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/05/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 03/07/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/07/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/13/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 03/14/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/19/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/19/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/20/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/20/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/09/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/09/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/09/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 04/11/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 04/11/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/18/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/18/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/18/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/23/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/23/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/25/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/30/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/02/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 05/07/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 05/07/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/08/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/16/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/22/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/22/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/22/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/04/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/04/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/04/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/18/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/18/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/18/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/08/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/08/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/11/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/22/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/09/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/09/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/09/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/09/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/09/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/13/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/13/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/17/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/17/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/17/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/19/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 09/19/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 09/25/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/25/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/26/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/26/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/01/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/01/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/01/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/01/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/03/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/08/2002
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 11/12/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/22/2002