There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Popular Titles

Arlington National Cemetery bill (Identified by CRS)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend title 38, United States Code, to enact into law eligibility of certain Reservists and their dependents for burial in Arlington National Cemetery, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to enact into law eligibility of certain veterans and their dependents for burial in Arlington National Cemetery.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/20/2001Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 11/19/2001 H10476-10477)
12/19/2001Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 107-346.
12/06/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/20/2001SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
12/20/2001-11:32amHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
12/20/2001-11:32amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/20/2001-11:32amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 11/19/2001 H10476-10477)
12/20/2001-11:31amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10936-10937)
12/19/2001-6:31pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/19/2001-6:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3423.
12/19/2001-6:16pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10476-10480)
12/19/2001-6:16pmHouseMr. Smith (NJ) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/19/2001HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 205.
12/19/2001HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 107-346.
12/13/2001HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
12/13/2001HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
12/13/2001HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
12/07/2001HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2231-2232)
12/06/2001HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
12/06/2001HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (17)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs12/06/2001 Referred to
12/13/2001 Hearings by
12/13/2001 Markup by
12/19/2001 Reported by H. Rept. 107-346
Senate Veterans' Affairs12/20/2001 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3423. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/20/2001)

Makes eligible for burial in Arlington National Cemetery a member of the reserves (and dependents)who: (1) at the time of death was under 60 years of age and who, but for such age, would have been eligible for military retired pay, on the same basis as a member of the armed forces who dies entitled to retired pay; or (2) dies in the line of duty while on active duty for training or inactive duty training, on the same basis as a member of the armed forces who dies while on active duty.

Authorizes the Secretary of the Army, after consulting with victims' families, to construct and place in such Cemetery a memorial marker honoring the victims of the acts of terrorism against the United States on September 11, 2001.