Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/23/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/13/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/26/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/26/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/26/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/05/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/05/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/07/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/20/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/09/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/09/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/09/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/09/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 04/11/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/17/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/17/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/17/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/17/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/23/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/23/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/23/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/30/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/01/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/15/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/16/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/16/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/22/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/04/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/04/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/04/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/05/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/05/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 06/18/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/26/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 07/08/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/12/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/22/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/22/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/04/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/04/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/04/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/10/2002
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/24/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/09/2002