Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 04/11/2002
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/11/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/23/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/23/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 04/23/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/23/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/23/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/23/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/25/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/12/2002