Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 12/19/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 12/19/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 12/19/2001
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 12/19/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 12/19/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/19/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 12/19/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/19/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 12/19/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 12/19/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 12/19/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 12/19/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 12/19/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 12/19/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 12/19/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 12/19/2001
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 12/19/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 12/19/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/19/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 12/19/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 12/20/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/20/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 12/20/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/23/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 01/23/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/23/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/29/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/29/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/29/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/06/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/06/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 02/06/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/06/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/06/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/06/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/06/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/06/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/06/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/12/2002
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/13/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/14/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/27/2002
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/05/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/05/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/12/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/12/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/12/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 03/12/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/18/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/18/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/19/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/19/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/10/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/10/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/17/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/01/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/01/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/13/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/20/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/08/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/17/2002
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/23/2002