Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 12/12/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/20/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/20/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 12/20/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 12/20/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 01/23/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/23/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/06/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/28/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/05/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/12/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/12/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/19/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/19/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/19/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/09/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/09/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/22/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/30/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/30/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/30/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/30/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/30/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/07/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/07/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/07/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/12/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/12/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/12/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/13/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/19/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/25/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/25/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/25/2002
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/27/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/10/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/10/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/25/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/26/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/10/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/10/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/10/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/24/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/25/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/26/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/10/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/16/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/13/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/13/2002