Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 12/12/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 02/05/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/06/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/27/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/08/2002