Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/13/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 12/13/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 12/13/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 12/13/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 12/19/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 12/19/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 12/19/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/19/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/19/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/19/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 12/19/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 12/19/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/19/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 12/19/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/19/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 12/20/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/20/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 12/20/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 01/25/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/27/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/27/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/06/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/06/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/06/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/20/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/20/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/20/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/10/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/10/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/10/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 04/10/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/10/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 04/18/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/18/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 05/02/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/09/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/09/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/09/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew