Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 12/18/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/18/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/18/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 12/18/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 12/18/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 12/19/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 12/20/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 12/20/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 01/23/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/05/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/26/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/26/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/19/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/23/2002
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/25/2002