Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/12/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/09/2002
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 04/11/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/18/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 04/18/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/18/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/23/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/23/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/25/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/14/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/14/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/14/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/23/2002