Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 12/19/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 12/19/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/19/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 12/19/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/19/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 12/19/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 12/19/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 12/19/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 12/19/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 12/19/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 12/19/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 12/19/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 12/19/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 12/19/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 12/19/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 12/19/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 12/19/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 12/20/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/23/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/23/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 01/23/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/23/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/23/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 01/25/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/29/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/29/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 02/04/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/05/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/06/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/08/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/12/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 02/26/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/26/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/26/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/28/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/04/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/04/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/04/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/04/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/04/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 03/04/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/04/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/04/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/05/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/06/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/06/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/06/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/07/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/07/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/07/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/12/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/12/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/12/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/13/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/13/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/13/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/13/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/13/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 03/18/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/19/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/20/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 04/09/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 04/09/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/09/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/23/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/25/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/30/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/14/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/04/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/04/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/13/2002