Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 01/29/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/29/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 01/29/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/06/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/06/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/24/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 04/24/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/23/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/05/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/05/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/13/2002
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/24/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/24/2002
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/26/2002