Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 12/20/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/13/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 02/13/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/28/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/07/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/17/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/18/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/18/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/12/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/12/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/12/2002