Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 12/20/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 12/20/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 12/20/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 01/29/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/29/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/05/2002
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/05/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/05/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/05/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/07/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/07/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/13/2002
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 02/13/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/26/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/26/2002
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 02/26/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/26/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/26/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/26/2002
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 02/26/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/06/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/12/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/18/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/20/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/09/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/11/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/16/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/23/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/30/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/02/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/15/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/05/2002
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/21/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/25/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/22/2002