Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 12/20/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 12/20/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 12/20/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 12/20/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 01/29/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/05/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/08/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/08/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/11/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/01/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 06/06/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/06/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/11/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/11/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/26/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/26/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/11/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/24/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/04/2002