Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/14/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 02/14/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/14/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 02/14/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/14/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/14/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/14/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/14/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/14/2001
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 02/14/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/14/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/27/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/27/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/27/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/27/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 02/27/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/29/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/29/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/29/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/29/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/29/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/29/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/29/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/03/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/03/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/03/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 05/24/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/24/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/24/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/05/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/05/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/24/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/05/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/10/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/29/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/18/2002