Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/06/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/07/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/19/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/16/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/18/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/24/2002