Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 12/20/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/26/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/26/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/26/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 02/26/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/26/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/14/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/14/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/14/2002
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/14/2002
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/14/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/14/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/14/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/14/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/14/2002
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/14/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/14/2002
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/14/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/14/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/20/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/20/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/20/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/20/2002
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/02/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/02/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/02/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/02/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/09/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/18/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/18/2002