Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/05/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/05/2002
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/05/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/05/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/05/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/05/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/05/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/05/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/05/2002
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 02/05/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 02/05/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/05/2002
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/06/2002
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/06/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/06/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/06/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/06/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/06/2002
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/06/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/06/2002
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 02/06/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/06/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/06/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/06/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/06/2002
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/06/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/06/2002
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/06/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 02/06/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/06/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/07/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/07/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/07/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 02/07/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/07/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 02/07/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/07/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/07/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/07/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/07/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/07/2002
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 02/07/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/07/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/07/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 02/07/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/07/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/07/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/08/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/08/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 02/08/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/13/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/13/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/26/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/26/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/06/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/06/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/06/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/10/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/10/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/01/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/01/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/12/2002
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/13/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/27/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/17/2002