Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/24/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 01/24/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/24/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 01/24/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 02/13/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/13/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 02/13/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/13/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/13/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/13/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/13/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/13/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/13/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/13/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/13/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/13/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/13/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 02/13/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/13/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 02/13/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/13/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/13/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/13/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/13/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/20/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/20/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/20/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/20/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/11/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/11/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/18/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/18/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/18/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/25/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/25/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 04/25/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/25/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/09/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/09/2002