Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/24/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/24/2002
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 01/29/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/12/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/19/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/19/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/19/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/19/2002
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/27/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/26/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/26/2002
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/26/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/26/2002
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 07/26/2002
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/26/2002