Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/05/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/08/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/14/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/20/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/20/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/20/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/10/2002