Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 01/29/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/29/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 01/29/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/04/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/04/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/04/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 02/04/2002
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/04/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/12/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/12/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/12/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/12/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/12/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/14/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/14/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/26/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/26/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/26/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/28/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/06/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/06/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 03/11/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/11/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/11/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/11/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/13/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/15/2002