Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 01/29/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/27/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/27/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/27/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/27/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/27/2002
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/27/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/27/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/07/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/07/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 04/11/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 04/11/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/11/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/11/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 04/11/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/11/2002
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/11/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/11/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/11/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/11/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/11/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/11/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/11/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/11/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/11/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/11/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/11/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/18/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/18/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/18/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/18/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/18/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/18/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/18/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/18/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/18/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/25/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/25/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/25/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 04/25/2002
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/25/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/16/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/16/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/16/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/16/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/16/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/16/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/16/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/16/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/05/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 06/05/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/05/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/05/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/05/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/23/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/23/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/23/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/23/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/23/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/23/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/23/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/23/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/26/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/26/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/26/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/13/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/10/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/10/2002
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/10/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/10/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/10/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/10/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/10/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/10/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/10/2002