Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/05/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/05/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/05/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/05/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/05/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/06/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/12/2002
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/12/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 02/12/2002
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 02/12/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/12/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/26/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 02/26/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/26/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/26/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/05/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/06/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 03/06/2002
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/12/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/12/2002
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/12/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/12/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/12/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/14/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/19/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/19/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/19/2002
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/19/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/20/2002
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/20/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 04/09/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/09/2002
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/09/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/23/2002
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/23/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/09/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/15/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/15/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/15/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 05/16/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/16/2002
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/16/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/16/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/16/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/16/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/21/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/05/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/05/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/05/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/05/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/12/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/25/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/25/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/05/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/05/2002