Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/04/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/04/2002
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 02/04/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/04/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/04/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/04/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/04/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/04/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 02/04/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/04/2002
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/04/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/04/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 02/04/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/04/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/04/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/04/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 02/04/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/04/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/05/2002
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/05/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/05/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/05/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/05/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/05/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/05/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/05/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/05/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 02/05/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/05/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/05/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/05/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/05/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/06/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/06/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/06/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/06/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/06/2002
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/06/2002
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/12/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/12/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/12/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/12/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/12/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 02/12/2002
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 02/12/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 02/12/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/12/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/12/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/12/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/12/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/12/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/12/2002
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/12/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/12/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/12/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/12/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/13/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 02/13/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/14/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/14/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/14/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/14/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/14/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 02/26/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/26/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/28/2002
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/05/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/06/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/06/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/11/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/11/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/20/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/20/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/09/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/09/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/09/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/09/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/23/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 04/23/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/23/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/23/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/23/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/23/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/01/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/01/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/16/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/21/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/21/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/21/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/21/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/22/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/22/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/22/2002
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/22/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/18/2002
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/18/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/22/2002