Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/27/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/09/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/15/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/13/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/19/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/10/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 07/23/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/26/2002