Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 02/05/2002
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 02/05/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/05/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 02/05/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/05/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/05/2002
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/07/2002
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/13/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 04/16/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/16/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 04/25/2002