Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/05/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/05/2002
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 02/05/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 02/05/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/05/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/05/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 02/05/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 02/05/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/05/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/05/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/05/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2]* 02/05/2002
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/05/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 02/05/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/05/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/05/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/07/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/07/2002
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/07/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/12/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/12/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/12/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/13/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/20/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/20/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/09/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/09/2002
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 04/10/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/16/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 04/16/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/18/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/23/2002
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/24/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 05/01/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/14/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/05/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/19/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/19/2002
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/21/2002
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/25/2002
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/09/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew