Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/20/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/20/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/20/2002
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/20/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/20/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/20/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/25/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/17/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/17/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/04/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/13/2002