Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/08/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/29/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/29/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/29/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/24/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/26/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/26/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/16/2001