Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/14/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/14/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/14/2002
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/14/2002
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/14/2002
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/14/2002
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/14/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 03/14/2002
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/14/2002
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/18/2002
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/02/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/02/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/14/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/14/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/17/2002