Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/08/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/12/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/05/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/06/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/12/2002
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/20/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/20/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/09/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/09/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/09/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/15/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/15/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/23/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/25/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/29/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 05/01/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/02/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/09/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/09/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/14/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/14/2002
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/14/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/15/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/20/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/23/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/04/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/04/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/17/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/17/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/25/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/18/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/18/2002
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/18/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/18/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/18/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/22/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/22/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/22/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/22/2002
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/22/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/22/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/25/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/25/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/12/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/12/2002
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/12/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/12/2002
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 09/19/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/24/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/24/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/24/2002
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/24/2002
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/03/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/07/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 11/13/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/14/2002