Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/12/2002
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 02/12/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/14/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/26/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/26/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 02/26/2002
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/26/2002
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/26/2002
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/26/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/28/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/28/2002
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/28/2002
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/28/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/28/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/28/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/06/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/06/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/07/2002
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/07/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 03/07/2002
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/07/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/07/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/07/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/07/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/12/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/12/2002
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/12/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/12/2002
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/12/2002
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/12/2002
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/12/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/19/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/19/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/19/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/19/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/19/2002
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/10/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/10/2002
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/16/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/16/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/18/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/23/2002
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/23/2002
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 04/24/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/08/2002
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/15/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/15/2002
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/16/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/16/2002