Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/12/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/12/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/12/2002
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/12/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 04/10/2002
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/10/2002
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/10/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 04/10/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/10/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/10/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/10/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 04/10/2002
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/10/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 04/30/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/30/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/30/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/09/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/22/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/24/2002