There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Vaccine Injury Compensation Program Improvement Act of 2002

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act with respect to the National Vaccine Injury Compensation Program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/13/2002Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/05/2002Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/14/2002Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E154)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2002Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2002Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/13/2002
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/13/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/13/2002
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/13/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/13/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/13/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/13/2002
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/13/2002
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/13/2002
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/13/2002
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/13/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/14/2002
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/14/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/14/2002
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/26/2002
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/04/2002
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/06/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/19/2002
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/19/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/19/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/09/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/17/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 05/07/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/07/2002
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/07/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/23/2002
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/04/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/04/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/04/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/04/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/06/2002
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/10/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/11/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/18/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/08/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/12/2002
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/12/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/04/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 09/04/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/09/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/17/2002
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/19/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/19/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/25/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/04/2002

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/13/2002 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/05/2002 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3741.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3741. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/13/2002)

National Vaccine Injury Compensation Program Improvement Act of 2002 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to: (1) revise the basis for calculating the projected lost earnings of a person who sustained a vaccine-related injury; (2) increase the award for a vaccine-related death; (3) allow compensation for expenses for family counseling and establishing guardianship; (4) allow payment of interim attorneys' fees and costs; (5) establish a procedure for paying attorneys' fees; (6) extend from two to six years the statute of limitations for injuries or death from a vaccine set forth in the Vaccine Injury Table; (7) revise the membership and meeting schedule of the Advisory Commission on Childhood Vaccines; and (8) direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services to conduct a public service announcement campaign about the availability of the Program.

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to increase the limit on Vaccine Injury Compensation Trust Fund administrative expenses.