Committees: H.R.3763 — 107th Congress (2001-2002)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services02/14/2002 Referred to
04/09/2002 Hearings by
04/16/2002 Markup by
04/22/2002 Reported by H. Rept. 107-414
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Capital Markets, Insurance and Government Sponsored Enterprises03/04/2002 Referred to
04/11/2002 Discharged from
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs04/25/2002 Referred to
07/15/2002 Discharged from