Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 02/14/2002
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/13/2002
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/17/2002
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/17/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/17/2002
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/15/2002
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 05/15/2002
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/15/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/04/2002
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/04/2002
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/11/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/18/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/24/2002