Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/04/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/04/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/04/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/04/2002
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/04/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/04/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/04/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/04/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/04/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/04/2002
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/04/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/04/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/04/2002
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/12/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/12/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/12/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/12/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/09/2002
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 04/09/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/09/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 04/09/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/09/2002
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/24/2002
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/24/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/24/2002
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 04/24/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/20/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/20/2002
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/20/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/20/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/20/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/11/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/11/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/11/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/11/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/17/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/17/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/17/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/25/2002
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/25/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/25/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/26/2002
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 07/26/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/04/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/04/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/09/2002
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/09/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/07/2002
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/07/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/07/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/07/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 11/14/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew