Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/14/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/27/2002
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/27/2002
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/27/2002
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/27/2002
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 02/27/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/13/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/13/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/13/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/19/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/19/2002
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/11/2002
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/11/2002
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/24/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/24/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/24/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/24/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/14/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/14/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/25/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/25/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/18/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/18/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/25/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/25/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/25/2002
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/05/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 09/05/2002
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/05/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/18/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/16/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/16/2002